This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:27:57 (UTC).

PULEO VS. CARVELLI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 PULEO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARVELLI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROSALIE PULEO

Defendants

KATHY CARVELLI

JOHN CARVELLI

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • STIPULATION/ORDER - OTHER (SC MEDIATION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/02/2016; Filing Party: THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • MEDIATION WAS SUCCESSFUL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/02/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - PERSONAL FILED BY PULEO, ROSALIE ON 03/07/2016; Filing Party: PULEO, ROSALIE ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY PULEO, ROSALIE ON 03/07/2016; Filing Party: PULEO, ROSALIE ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PULEO, ROSALIE FOR 03 - SMALL CLAIMS $1,500 OR LESS IN THE AMOUNT OF 30.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927282 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751507.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/02/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY PUELO, ROSALIE ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: PUELO, ROSALIE ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.