This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/01/2022 at 03:47:06 (UTC).

PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES VS. ESTHER JEON

Case Summary

On 04/18/2022 PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against ESTHER JEON. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Property Management Associates

Defendants

Esther Jeon

Lawrence Narcisse

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Grimm & Scholnick

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

PLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13036087 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12864108.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13036087 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12864108.

CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

CASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/29/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/29/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/29/2022

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/29/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY NARCISSE, LAWRENCE ON 05/02/2022

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY NARCISSE, LAWRENCE ON 05/02/2022

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31151374 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31151374 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/12/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/12/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/12/2022

PROOF OF SUBSTITUTE SERVICE FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/12/2022

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/12/2022

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/12/2022

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/12/2022.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/12/2022.

VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/12/2022

VERIFICATION BY LANDLORD REGARDING RENTAL ASSISTANCE FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/12/2022

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/18/2022 02:36:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/18/2022 02:36:00 PM.

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NARCISSE, LAWRENCE ON 05/20/2022

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NARCISSE, LAWRENCE ON 05/20/2022

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/18/2022

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 05/18/2022

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21172680 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21162182 RECEIVED ON 05/20/2022 11:39:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13055505 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12883521.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41337693 RECEIVED ON 05/20/2022 11:39:36 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY NARCISSE, LAWRENCE ON 05/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY NARCISSE, LAWRENCE ON 05/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY NARCISSE, LAWRENCE ON 05/20/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • DocketNARCISSE, LAWRENCE ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 05/20/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1977184 RECEIVED ON 04/18/2022 12:12:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S MANDATORY COVER SHEET AND SUPPLEMENTAL ALLEGATIONS - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES ON 04/18/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13036087 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12864108.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER KOHLER, ROBERT ON 04/18/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE INITIATION FORM(S) HAVE BEEN GENERATED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROPERTY MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATES INC. is a litigant