This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/01/2021 at 06:41:20 (UTC).

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC VS. ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH AUTHORITY

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH AUTHORITY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Prime Healthcare Anaheim, LLC

Prime Healthcare La Palma, LLC

Prime Healthcare Services - Garden Grove, LLC

Prime Healthcare Huntington Beach, LLC

Defendants

Varis, LLC

Orange County Health Authority

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

King & Spalding LLP

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 01/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 01/14/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 01/13/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 01/13/2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 01/05/2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 01/05/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 12/09/2020

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 12/09/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12810866 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12637924.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12810866 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12637924.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/19/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/19/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/19/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/19/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/19/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/19/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 01/14/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2974529 RECEIVED ON 01/14/2021 12:30:34 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41148993 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2021 06:59:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1800165 RECEIVED ON 01/05/2021 03:56:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 01/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 12/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2964972 RECEIVED ON 12/09/2020 11:12:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY AMERICANLEGALNET FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12810866 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12637924.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41134667 RECEIVED ON 11/19/2020 06:41:09 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER ZELTZER, NANCY ON 11/19/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE LA PALMA, LLC; PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM, LLC ON 11/19/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE ANAHEIM LLC DBA WEST ANAHEIM MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE HUNTINGTON BEACH LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where ORANGE COUNTY HEALTH AUTHORITY is a litigant