This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 07:46:37 (UTC).

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC VS. CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH

Case Summary

On 12/05/2017 PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC

PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GRO

Respondents

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF HEALTH

CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DAVIS WRIGHT TREMAINE LLP

Respondent Attorney

Office of the Attorney General, CA Department of Justice

Other Attorneys

OFFICE OF THE ATTORNEY GENERAL, CA DEP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH ON 01/30/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH ON 01/30/2019

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/10/2019

JUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/10/2019

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/19/2018.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/19/2018.

ORDER - OTHER (STATEMENT OF DECISION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/13/2018

ORDER - OTHER (STATEMENT OF DECISION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/13/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 12/06/2018 08:45:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 12/06/2018 08:45:00 AM.

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH ON 11/14/2018

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH ON 11/14/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/23/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/23/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3718054 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3718054 REJECTED.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/10/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/10/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 09/27/2018 03:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR UNDER SUBMISSION RULING 09/27/2018 03:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION FOR WRIT 09/19/2018 10:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR PETITION FOR WRIT 09/19/2018 10:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 09/06/2018

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 09/06/2018

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 08/30/2018

NOTICE OF LODGING FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 08/30/2018

OPPOSITION (RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION BRIEF) FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH ON 08/08/2018

OPPOSITION (RESPONDENT'S OPPOSITION BRIEF) FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH ON 08/08/2018

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 08/23/2018

REPLY - OTHER FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 08/23/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12382189 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12205919.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12382189 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12205919.

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH ON 01/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2757313 RECEIVED ON 01/30/2019 11:31:12 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION HAS BEEN DENIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 01/10/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 12/19/2018.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2744236 RECEIVED ON 12/19/2018 12:42:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (STATEMENT OF DECISION) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 12/13/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3722603 RECEIVED ON 10/23/2018 03:33:55 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL 12/06/2018 08:45:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/03/2018 AT 08:45:00 AM IN C25 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 12/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED PETITION (FIRST (PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE)) FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 12/08/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2620098 RECEIVED ON 12/08/2017 03:32:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER FELL, SHEILA ON 12/05/2017.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12262951 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12086651.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE FILED BY PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE, LLC ON 12/05/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3614146 RECEIVED ON 12/05/2017 02:25:13 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where California Department of Health is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIME HEALTHCARE SERVICES - GARDEN GROVE LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CALIFORNIA DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH is a litigant