This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 08:44:18 (UTC).

POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC VS. PAUL A. LANGLAND

Case Summary

On 07/21/2017 POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against PAUL A LANGLAND. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs, Defendants and Cross Defendants

POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC

POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC

SURF ENERGY HB, LLC

POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LL

Donald G. Parsons

Madhukar Murarka

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

PAUL A. LANGLAND

HOC OPERATING, LLC

POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC

STEPHEN T. HARRIS

DAVID WOOLSEY

ALFRED CRISLER

ROBERT BERTON

SURF ENERGY, LLC

HB-1, LLC

SURF ENERGY HB, LLC

PAUL LANGLAND

HOC of California, LLC

Donald G. Parsons

DONALD G. PARSONS AS TRUSTEE OF THE PA

Donald G. Parsons as Trustee of the Parsons Irrevocable Trust dated December 22, 2004

POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LL

Defendants and Others

PAUL A. LANGLAND

HOC OPERATING, LLC

STEPHEN T. HARRIS

HB-1, LLC

HOC of California, LLC

12 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant, Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

CLIFFORD & BROWN

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Bewley, Lassleben & Miller, LLP

LAW OFFICES OF MICHAEL L. MCQUEEN, APC

CLIFFORD & BROWN

Lanza & Smith

KIMBALL, TIREY & ST. JOHN LLP

Bewley Lassleben & Miller, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12597937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12422054.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12597937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12422054.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/02/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 08/02/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12592789 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12416860.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12592789 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12416860.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ROE 1) FILED BY HB-1, LLC; HOC OPERATING, LLC; HARRIS, STEPHEN T.; LANGLAND, PAUL A. ON 07/10/2019

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT (ROE 1) FILED BY HB-1, LLC; HOC OPERATING, LLC; HARRIS, STEPHEN T.; LANGLAND, PAUL A. ON 07/10/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/19/2019 10:55:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 06/19/2019 10:55:00 AM.

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC ON 05/15/2019

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC ON 05/15/2019

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 05/15/2019

MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION/INSPECTION OF DOCUMENTS OR THINGS FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 05/15/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/16/2019 04:03:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/16/2019 04:03:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS 03/04/2019 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS 03/04/2019 02:00:00 PM.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/05/2018

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/05/2018

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY CRISLER, ALFRED; SURF ENERGY, LLC ON 07/20/2018

SEPARATE STATEMENT FILED BY CRISLER, ALFRED; SURF ENERGY, LLC ON 07/20/2018

ORDER - OTHER (TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND SET ASIDE DEFAULT) FILED BY SURF ENERGY HB, LLC ON 11/30/2017

ORDER - OTHER (TO VACATE JUDGMENT AND SET ASIDE DEFAULT) FILED BY SURF ENERGY HB, LLC ON 11/30/2017

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 09/13/2017

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 09/13/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SURF ENERGY HB, LLC ON 07/20/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY SURF ENERGY HB, LLC ON 07/20/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12177374 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12001069.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12177374 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12001069.

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY HB-1, LLC; HOC OPERATING, LLC; SURF ENERGY, LLC; SURF ENERGY HB, LLC; HARRIS, STEPHEN T.; CRISLER, ALFRED; LANGLAND, PAUL ON 10/24/2017

ANSWER (GENERAL DENIAL) FILED BY HB-1, LLC; HOC OPERATING, LLC; SURF ENERGY, LLC; SURF ENERGY HB, LLC; HARRIS, STEPHEN T.; CRISLER, ALFRED; LANGLAND, PAUL ON 10/24/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/03/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/03/2017

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 08/01/2017

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 08/01/2017

262 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12600300 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12424481.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1651419 RECEIVED ON 08/02/2019 05:08:01 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/27/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N05 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 02/21/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN N05 AT NORTH JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HB-1, LLC; HOC OPERATING, LLC; LANGLAND, PAUL A.; HARRIS, STEPHEN T. ON 07/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2821038 RECEIVED ON 07/30/2019 08:55:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 08/05/2019 10:43:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12597937 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12422054.

    Read MoreRead Less
420 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 08/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1406129 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2017 11:29:55 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER GASTELUM, JOHN ON 07/21/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12191943 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12015643.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY POWERDRIVE OIL AND GAS COMPANY, LLC; POWERDRIVE ENERGY SERVICES COMPANY, LLC ON 07/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1403270 RECEIVED ON 07/21/2017 04:35:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less