This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:22:32 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. ZEKA T REYNOZA

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ZEKA T REYNOZA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

ZEKA T REYNOZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430549 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254421.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430549 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254421.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/02/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/02/2013

JUDGMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

JUDGMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2014
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 1330.37 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST REYNOZA, ZEKA T .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3103065 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2014 07:52:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 485636 RECEIVED ON 10/02/2013 09:41:08 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430549 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254421.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348327 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 02:22:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less