This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:15:17 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. WILLIAM CAPLIN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILLIAM CAPLIN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

WILLIAM CAPLIN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Court Documents

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4363656 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4363656 REJECTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/30/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/30/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/07/2015

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/07/2015

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 02/21/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 02/21/2014

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2015
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/07/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4374877 RECEIVED ON 05/07/2015 02:04:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4363656 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 02/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3116323 RECEIVED ON 02/21/2014 01:30:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 484427 RECEIVED ON 09/30/2013 11:27:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 462571 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 03:22:47 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less