This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:21:12 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. SERGIO F ALMADER

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SERGIO F ALMADER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

SERGIO F ALMADER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/03/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/03/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/26/2014

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/26/2014

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALMADER, SERGIO F ON 09/27/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALMADER, SERGIO F ON 09/27/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2014

AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2014

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/13/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/13/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/03/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3210491 RECEIVED ON 11/03/2014 01:05:57 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4252600 RECEIVED ON 09/26/2014 10:14:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2014
  • NOTICE OF HEARING OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2014
  • COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/19/2014 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1184321 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2014 10:58:29 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY ALMADER, SERGIO F ON 09/27/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2279388 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013 03:25:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1105586 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 03:21:44 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less