This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/25/2022 at 04:41:14 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. SALWA A ISMAEL

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SALWA A ISMAEL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Salwa A Ismael

Irvine, CA 92620-3742

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Pierce

Jordan Cook

Kristen Brinkerhoff

Lori N. Williams

Michelle Mitchell

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13145261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12973355.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13145261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12973355.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/13/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/13/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/14/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/14/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/21/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/21/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41425869 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2022 11:20:56 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/14/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31244441 RECEIVED ON 12/14/2022 05:54:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21247009 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2022 03:35:09 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13145261 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12973355.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41417563 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2022 12:10:28 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Cook

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Mitchell