This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:15:14 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. NANCY M TOWNSEND

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against NANCY M TOWNSEND. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

NANCY M TOWNSEND

Huntington Beach, CA 92646-1871

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 02/06/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 02/06/2014

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431073 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254945.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431073 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254945.

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/06/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/06/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/06/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 02/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1146085 RECEIVED ON 02/06/2014 02:22:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2277248 RECEIVED ON 09/06/2013 10:02:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11431073 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254945.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2270710 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 02:08:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less