This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:20:52 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. MINH H NGO

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MINH H NGO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

MINH H NGO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430603 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254475.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430603 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254475.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/26/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/26/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE (DECLARATION OF) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/12/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE (DECLARATION OF) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/26/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2295201 RECEIVED ON 11/26/2013 03:39:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2013
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE (DECLARATION OF) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2278812 RECEIVED ON 09/12/2013 11:17:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430603 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254475.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348421 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 04:07:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less