This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:17:48 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. MARIA PALACIOS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MARIA PALACIOS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

MARIA PALACIOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/30/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/30/2013

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/31/13) RECEIVED ON 10/30/2013.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/31/13) RECEIVED ON 10/30/2013.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/30/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/30/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/29/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/29/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/30/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/30/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430923 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254795.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430923 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254795.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2013
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 1964.94 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 0.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST PALACIOS, MARIA .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 10/31/13) RECEIVED ON 10/30/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 499355 RECEIVED ON 10/30/2013 09:02:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/29/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1109132 RECEIVED ON 08/29/2013 12:07:28 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430923 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254795.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1105487 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 12:24:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less