This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:15:01 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. LINH T TRAN

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LINH T TRAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

LINH T TRAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 05/24/14) RECEIVED ON 05/13/2014.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 05/24/14) RECEIVED ON 05/13/2014.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/18/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/18/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430613 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254485.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430613 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254485.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/13/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/13/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/13/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/13/2014

WAIVER (ATTORNEY FEES; CCP 1033) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/13/2014

WAIVER (ATTORNEY FEES; CCP 1033) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/13/2014

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/07/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/07/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/04/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/04/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2014
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2014
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2014
  • THE COURT ENTERS JUDGMENT ON THE COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FOR PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC IN THE AMOUNT OF 1372.23 PRINCIPAL, 0.00 PUNITIVE DAMAGES, 346.00 PREJUDGMENT COSTS AND 0.00 ATTORNEY FEES AGAINST TRAN, LINH T .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • WAIVER (ATTORNEY FEES; CCP 1033) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 05/24/14) RECEIVED ON 05/13/2014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 05/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4189402 RECEIVED ON 05/13/2014 03:36:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 372496 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2013 09:29:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/07/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 368138 RECEIVED ON 10/07/2013 02:46:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/04/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 472722 RECEIVED ON 09/04/2013 02:34:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430613 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254485.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348456 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 04:52:48 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less