This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:24:02 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. LINDA HOBROCK

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LINDA HOBROCK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

LINDA HOBROCK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/08/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/08/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430864 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254736.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430864 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254736.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/30/2013

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/30/2013

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2013
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/08/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/11/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4104974 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2013 03:40:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/30/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 355346 RECEIVED ON 08/30/2013 01:41:40 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430864 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254736.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2270562 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 10:36:35 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less