Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 02:15:43 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. KARELLA CHEEK

Case Summary

On 06/09/2021 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KARELLA CHEEK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    06/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Karella Cheek

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Portfolio Recovery Associates LLC

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/23/2021

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/23/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/17/2021

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/17/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12897823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12725630.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12897823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12725630.

DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

DECLARATION - OTHER (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31031062 RECEIVED ON 06/23/2021 10:22:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41206707 RECEIVED ON 06/17/2021 02:24:53 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12897823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12725630.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (VENUE) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 06/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41203008 RECEIVED ON 06/09/2021 09:27:15 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant