This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:24:18 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. GARY TANOUS

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GARY TANOUS. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

GARY TANOUS

La Habra, CA 90631-4930

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant Attorney

USCLG, P.C.

 

Court Documents

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/02/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/02/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TANOUS, GARY ON 11/18/2013

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TANOUS, GARY ON 11/18/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 03/18/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 03/18/2014

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 11/19/2013.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 11/19/2013.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 03/18/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3125260 RECEIVED ON 03/18/2014 02:16:59 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 11/19/2013.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY TANOUS, GARY ON 11/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY TANOUS, GARY ON 11/18/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1126625 RECEIVED ON 11/18/2013 05:23:35 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/02/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 485633 RECEIVED ON 10/02/2013 09:35:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348248 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 01:06:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less