This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/27/2023 at 03:51:21 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. EDITH VAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against EDITH VAZQUEZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Edith Vazquez

San Juan Capistrano, CA 92675

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Emily Pierce, Esq.

Jordan Cook, Esq.

Michelle Mitchell, Esq.

Kristen Brinkerhoff, Esq.

Lori Williams, Esq.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164006 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992103.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164006 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992103.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/18/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/18/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41436054 RECEIVED ON 01/18/2023 08:30:10 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41435402 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2023 07:31:47 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13164006 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12992103.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31255360 RECEIVED ON 01/12/2023 07:14:04 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less