This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/23/2017 at 05:14:43 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. ARMANDO VALLADOLID

Case Summary

On 08/12/2013 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARMANDO VALLADOLID. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2013

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

Defendant

ARMANDO VALLADOLID

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/5/13) RECEIVED ON 12/04/2013.

JUDGMENT (FILED AND ENTERED ON 12/5/13) RECEIVED ON 12/04/2013.

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/13/2013

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/13/2013

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/25/2014

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/25/2014

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/20/2014

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/20/2014

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT 10/16/2014 09:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT 10/16/2014 09:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11665585 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11489723.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11665585 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11489723.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430510 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254382.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430510 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254382.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

MOTION TO VACATE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/25/2014

MOTION TO VACATE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/25/2014

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/04/2013

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/04/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/16/2014

ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/16/2014

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/04/2013

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/04/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/04/2013

DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/04/2013

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 11/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3218057 RECEIVED ON 11/20/2014 11:11:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER AFTER HEARING FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 10/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT 10/16/2014 09:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2014
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE JUDGMENT SCHEDULED FOR 10/16/2014 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C63 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11665585 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11489723.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/05/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4115100 RECEIVED ON 12/04/2013 01:17:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 09/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 477222 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2013 02:04:14 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 131 - 1 COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 181.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11430510 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11254382.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION - OTHER FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2013
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT (B&P 6322.1) FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 08/12/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2013
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 348182 RECEIVED ON 08/12/2013 11:41:14 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less