This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/25/2022 at 04:40:33 (UTC).

PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC VS. AMY N TORRES

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AMY N TORRES. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portfolio Recovery Associates, LLC

Defendant

Amy N Torres

Santa Ana, CA 92704-2199

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan Cook

Kristen Brinkerhoff

Lori N. Williams

Emily Pierce

Michelle Mitchell

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13145105 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12973199.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13145105 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12973199.

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/13/2022

PROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/13/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/21/2022

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/21/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21250192 RECEIVED ON 12/21/2022 10:53:35 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF NON-SERVICE FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41422647 RECEIVED ON 12/13/2022 03:21:03 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 170 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13145105 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12973199.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41417580 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2022 12:24:36 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES, LLC ON 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PORTFOLIO RECOVERY ASSOCIATES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jordan Cook

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michelle Mitchell