This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 05:44:51 (UTC).

POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. VS. LOUIS THOMAS GABRIEL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2020 POOL ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against LOUIS THOMAS GABRIEL. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pool & Electrical Products, Inc.

Defendants

Louis Thomas Gabriel III

LOUIS THOMAS GABRIEL

Outdoor Concepts Landscape & Design, Inc.

Lexon Insurance Company

Deep Sea Hospitality, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael D. May Attorney at Law

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/14/2020

COMPLAINT FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/14/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/14/2020

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/14/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/14/2020

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/14/2020

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12780311 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12607030.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12780311 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12607030.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

JURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: HUNT; Department: C23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21014505 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2021 03:25:18 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1843037 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2021 11:43:45 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21014314 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2021 11:43:37 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1843036 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2021 11:43:27 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41189257 RECEIVED ON 05/04/2021 11:43:18 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 10/17/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 09/14/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12780311 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12607030.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY POOL & ELECTRICAL PRODUCTS, INC. ON 09/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3936100 RECEIVED ON 09/13/2020 12:26:50 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pool & Electrical products, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where OUTDOOR CONCEPTS LANDSCAOE & DESIGN, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEXON INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MAY MICHAEL D. ESQ.