This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/13/2023 at 03:42:11 (UTC).

PMH LABORATORY, INC. VS. KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/29/2022 PMH LABORATORY, INC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against KAISER PERMANENTE INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PMH Laboratory, Inc.

Defendants

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan, Inc.

Kaiser Permanente Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Keesal, Young & Logan

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 12/29/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 12/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 12/29/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 12/29/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13158772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12986869.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13158772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12986869.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/05/2023 07:41:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/05/2023 07:41:00 AM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/04/2023

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/04/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/17/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/20/2023

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/20/2023

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 02/24/2023

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 02/24/2023

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: MCCORMICK; Department: C13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31274017 RECEIVED ON 02/24/2023 10:08:49 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 02/24/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31258848 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2023 10:27:15 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41435887 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2023 04:30:23 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/17/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 11089653 RECEIVED ON 01/17/2023 04:15:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21254636 RECEIVED ON 01/04/2023 12:26:04 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 01/05/2023 07:41:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketTHE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SET ON 06/08/2023 IS ORDERED ADVANCED TO 04/06/2023 AT 09:00 AM IN C13.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/08/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C13 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13158772 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12986869.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21253197 RECEIVED ON 12/29/2022 05:26:07 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MCCORMICK, MELISSA ON 12/29/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PMH LABORATORY, INC. ON 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less