This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/08/2021 at 11:09:21 (UTC).

PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC VS. VIKRANT CHAUDHRY

Case Summary

On 11/13/2020 PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against VIKRANT CHAUDHRY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    11/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK,

PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC

Claimants

ROI Property Group 2, LLC

ROI Property Group Management

Defendants and Others

VIKRANT CHAUDHRY

VC LAW GROUP, LLP

Vikant Chaudhry

Cross Defendants

K&L Law Group, PC

Marc Lazo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Freedom Law Group, LLP

Chase Law & Associates, P.A.

Defendant and Other Attorney

Wilcox Dunakin Chrisopoulos, LLP

Cross Defendant Attorney

K & L Law Group, PC

 

Court Documents

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021.

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021.

NOTICE OF MOTION (MOTION TO BE RELIEVED OF COUNSEL) FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 12/01/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION (MOTION TO BE RELIEVED OF COUNSEL) FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 12/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 12/01/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 12/01/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 12/01/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 12/01/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 11/29/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD 11/29/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT 11/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT 11/08/2021 01:30:00 PM.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT 09/29/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION TO STRIKE PORTIONS OF COMPLAINT 09/29/2021 01:30:00 PM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12945609 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12773508.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12945609 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12773508.

DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY K&L LAW GROUP, PC; LAZO, MARC ON 09/20/2021

DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY K&L LAW GROUP, PC; LAZO, MARC ON 09/20/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY K&L LAW GROUP, PC; LAZO, MARC ON 09/20/2021

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY K&L LAW GROUP, PC; LAZO, MARC ON 09/20/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT 08/23/2021 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR DEMURRER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT 08/23/2021 01:30:00 PM.

AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY VC LAW GROUP, LLP; CHAUDHRY, VIKANT ON 08/10/2021

AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY VC LAW GROUP, LLP; CHAUDHRY, VIKANT ON 08/10/2021

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927825 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755700.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12927825 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12755700.

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 08/10/2021.

ORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 08/10/2021.

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 08/10/2021

MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 08/10/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 08/10/2021

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 08/10/2021

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: ZELTZER; Department: C34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2023
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: ZELTZER; Department: C34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: DEMURRER TO AMENDED CROSS-COMPLAINT; Judge: ZELTZER; Department: C34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • HearingDescription: MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL OF RECORD; Judge: ZELTZER; Department: C34

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING ATTORNEYS MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1923675 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 12:54:58 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (MOTION TO BE RELIEVED OF COUNSEL) FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31091915 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 12:53:06 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO BE RELIEVED AS COUNSEL FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21094636 RECEIVED ON 12/01/2021 12:54:02 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
64 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketJURY TRIAL REASSIGNED TO C34 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 09/25/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO NANCY ZELTZER EFFECTIVE 01/04/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/25/2023 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 08/25/2023 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C12 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12807941 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12635060.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1786761 RECEIVED ON 11/13/2020 05:24:31 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MELZER, LAYNE ON 11/13/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 11/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 11/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PLATINUM PROPERTIES INVESTOR NETWORK, INC ON 11/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROI PROPERTY GROUP 2, LLC is a litigant