This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/10/2019 at 05:50:50 (UTC).

PHILIP ALSING VS. WL HOMES LLC

Case Summary

On 11/08/2017 PHILIP ALSING filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against WL HOMES LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Civil Complex Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ALICIA BURNETT

GRETCHEN BURROW

TANYA BAILEY

GERMAN VILLARRAG

FRANK PARTH

OLGA VALENCIA

DORETTA STEELE

JUAN CUARA

BRET HASSLER

ERIC ROMERO

CHRIS BAILEY

DULCE CUARA

JEFFREY NGUYEN

STEFANI HASSLER

PHILIP ALSING

NATASHA ROMERO

DANA SILVA

Defendant and Other

WL HOMES LLC

Cross Defendants

LARRY METHVIN INSTALLATIONS INC

ACCENT TILE & MARBLE

54 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GELFER LAW GROUP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

MARTUCCI & ASSCOCIATES

Boornazian, Jensen & Garthe, A Professional Corporation

Wolfe & Wyman LLP

Other Attorneys

Mokri Vanis & Jones, LLP

Law Office of Lawrence M Burek

LEE, HERNANDEZ, LANDRUM & CARLSON

Skebba, Isaac & Buechler

BOORNAZIAN, JENSEN & GARTHE, A PROFESS

Diederich & Associates

Kennedy & Souza APC

Bohm Wildish & Matsen, Llp

Fredrickson Mazeika & Grant

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12556532 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12380418.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12556532 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12380418.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/20/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 05/20/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/15/2019

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/15/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY M.B.C. CONSTRUCTION INC ON 04/23/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED BY M.B.C. CONSTRUCTION INC ON 04/23/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/16/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 01/16/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12483339 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12307038.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12483339 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12307038.

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 09/14/2018

STIPULATION AND ORDER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 09/14/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BEMUS LANDSCAPE INC ON 07/23/2018

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY BEMUS LANDSCAPE INC ON 07/23/2018

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/14/2018

PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/14/2018

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12349664 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12173374.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FIRSTLEGALNETWORK FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE), 35 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - RESPONSE IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12349664 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12173374.

OBJECTION FILED BY PACIFIC MASONRY INC ON 05/10/2018

OBJECTION FILED BY PACIFIC MASONRY INC ON 05/10/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/04/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 05/04/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 04/06/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 04/06/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 04/06/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 04/06/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 04/06/2018

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 04/06/2018

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BURNETT, ALICIA; HASSLER, BRET; BAILEY, CHRIS; STEELE, DORETTA; CUARA, DULCE; ROMERO, ERIC; PARTH, FRANK; VILLARRAG, GERMAN; BURROW, GRETCHEN; NGUYEN, JEFFREY;OTHERS ON 03/02/2018

AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY BURNETT, ALICIA; HASSLER, BRET; BAILEY, CHRIS; STEELE, DORETTA; CUARA, DULCE; ROMERO, ERIC; PARTH, FRANK; VILLARRAG, GERMAN; BURROW, GRETCHEN; NGUYEN, JEFFREY;OTHERS ON 03/02/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 02/21/2018

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 02/21/2018

144 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/07/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4998971 RECEIVED ON 08/07/2019 11:47:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4998043 RECEIVED ON 08/05/2019 12:41:49 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ASSOCIATION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1650970 RECEIVED ON 08/01/2019 05:46:43 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4994117 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2019 02:59:45 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1646252 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (COVER SHEET) (ELECTRONIC FILING) FILED BY WL HOMES LLC ON 07/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
208 More Docket Entries
  • 11/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2017-11-30 08:41:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2018 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • THE COURT DEEMS THIS CASE EXCEPTIONAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 01/23/2018 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CLASTER, WILLIAM ON 11/08/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12250120 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12073842.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALSING, PHILIP; BAILEY, CHRIS; BAILEY, TANYA; BURNETT, ALICIA; BURROW, GRETCHEN; CUARA, JUAN; CUARA, DULCE; HASSLER, BRET; HASSLER, STEFANI; NGUYEN, JEFFREY;OTHERS ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALSING, PHILIP; BAILEY, CHRIS; BAILEY, TANYA; BURNETT, ALICIA; BURROW, GRETCHEN; CUARA, JUAN; CUARA, DULCE; HASSLER, BRET; HASSLER, STEFANI; NGUYEN, JEFFREY;OTHERS ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ALSING, PHILIP; BAILEY, CHRIS; BAILEY, TANYA; BURNETT, ALICIA; BURROW, GRETCHEN; CUARA, JUAN; CUARA, DULCE; HASSLER, BRET; HASSLER, STEFANI; NGUYEN, JEFFREY;OTHERS ON 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3605816 RECEIVED ON 11/08/2017 10:58:47 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less