This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:18:40 (UTC).

PHAN TRAN VS NGAN NGUYEN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 PHAN TRAN filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against NGAN NGUYEN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DE LA CRUZ, ANDRE. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****8294

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

DE LA CRUZ, ANDRE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

TRAN, PHAN NHAT

Respondent

NGUYEN, NGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2018
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/09/2018; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/09/2018; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 07/09/2018; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/09/2018 PRELIMINARY AND FINAL; Filing Party: NGUYEN, NGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 07/09/2018; Filing Party: NGUYEN, NGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • RETURN SHEET - DEFAULT 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 05/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • HEARING - MOTION - COMPEL / COMPLIANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/29/2018; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/29/2018; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 10/17/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY JUDICIAL OFFICER 10/17/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, NGAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/16/2017 5c.; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 10/16/2017 Response; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/16/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 10/16/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 10/10/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • SUMMONS 10/10/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 10/10/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 10/10/2017; Filing Party: TRAN, PHAN NHAT

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.