This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/04/2021 at 10:20:09 (UTC).

PETRONA HERNANDEZ VS. ANAHEIM CONVENTION CENTER

Case Summary

On 05/28/2020 PETRONA HERNANDEZ filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANAHEIM CONVENTION CENTER. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Petrona Hernandez

Defendants

Anaheim Convention Center

Stellar Entertainment Group, Inc.

City of Anaheim

Cross Defendant and Defendant

Stellar Entertainment Group, Inc.

Other and Defendant

City of Anaheim

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Gene J. Goldsman

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

Liedle & Larson, LLP

Walker & Kirkpatrick

Defendant and Other Attorney

Walker & Kirkpatrick

Other Attorneys

ANAHEIM CITY ATTORNEY'S OFFICE

 

Court Documents

AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) FILED BY STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC. ON 08/06/2021

AMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) FILED BY STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC. ON 08/06/2021

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12924026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12751871.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12924026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12751871.

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC. ON 08/03/2021

ANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC. ON 08/03/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 07/06/2021

PROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 07/06/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 07/02/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 07/02/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 06/24/2021

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 06/24/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 05/11/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 05/11/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21017199 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 21017199 REJECTED.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 04/29/2021

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 04/29/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 04/29/2021

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 04/29/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31009762 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 31009762 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12877996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12705752.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12877996 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12705752.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 04/14/2021

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 04/14/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 04/01/2021

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 04/01/2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 03/17/2021

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 03/17/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 03/29/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 03/29/2021

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 02/24/2021.

AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT RECEIVED ON 02/24/2021.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 02/25/2021

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 02/25/2021

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: JURY TRIAL; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: CRANDALL; Department: C33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER (FIRST) FILED BY STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC. ON 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41225551 RECEIVED ON 08/06/2021 09:43:52 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12924026 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12751871.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP, INC. ON 08/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21048775 RECEIVED ON 08/03/2021 11:14:24 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF ESERVICE FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 07/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31035009 RECEIVED ON 07/06/2021 09:01:54 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY CITY OF ANAHEIM ON 07/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
40 More Docket Entries
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: FAILURE TO COMPLY RE:CRC 3.110B SCHEDULED FOR 01/05/2021 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJURY TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C33 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12748625 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12575014.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41088586 RECEIVED ON 05/28/2020 10:30:28 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CRANDALL, JAMES ON 05/28/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY HERNANDEZ, PETRONA ON 05/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELLAR ENTERTAINMENT GROUP is a litigant