This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/12/2022 at 07:36:25 (UTC).

PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. VS. GENERAL MOTORS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/19/2022 PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GENERAL MOTORS, LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Petroleum Realty Group, Inc.

Defendants

General Motors, LLC

Simpson Irvine, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Law Offices of Adam Zolonz, APC

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/19/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/19/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/19/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/19/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/19/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/19/2022

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12996823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12824761.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12996823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12824761.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/26/2022

PROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/26/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: LEWIS; Department: C26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PERSONAL SERVICE FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/26/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41290339 RECEIVED ON 01/26/2022 09:36:34 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 06/27/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C26 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12996823 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12824761.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21112261 RECEIVED ON 01/19/2022 04:14:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER LEWIS, GREGORY ON 01/19/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PETROLEUM REALTY GROUP, INC. ON 01/19/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SIMPSON IRVINE INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA SIMPSON CHEVROLET OF IRVINE is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant