This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 14:33:55 (UTC).

PETE'S ROAD SERVICE, INC VS. HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC

Case Summary

On 03/18/2021 PETE'S ROAD SERVICE, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETE'S ROAD SERVICE, INC

Defendant

HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/2021 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER WAS VACATED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketCASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY PETE'S ROAD SERVICE, INC ON 04/06/2021; Filing Party: PETE'S ROAD SERVICE, INC ON 04/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/01/2021 AT 08:00:00 AM IN VCC5 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY EFFICIENTLEGALSUPPORT FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12859296 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12687015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3992446 RECEIVED ON 03/18/2021 09:40:08 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY PETE'S ROAD SERVICE, INC ON 03/18/2021; Filing Party: PETE'S ROAD SERVICE, INC ON 03/18/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PETES ROAD SERVICE INC is a litigant