This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:42 (UTC).

PETER PARK VS JANICE PARK

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 PETER PARK filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JANICE PARK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1709

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PARK, PETER SUNGWOO

Respondents

KIM, JUNGYEON

PARK, JANICE JUNGYEON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

NGUYEN, CARYN HONG THUY

Other Attorneys

SUH & SUH-LAW OFFICES OF, APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2017
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 06/01/2017; Filing Party: KIM, JUNGYEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 06/01/2017; Filing Party: KIM, JUNGYEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 06/01/2017; Filing Party: KIM, JUNGYEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 06/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/17/2017; Filing Party: PARK, PETER SUNGWOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 03/17/2017; Filing Party: PARK, PETER SUNGWOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2017
  • RETURN SHEET - JUDGMENT 03/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 01/31/2017; Filing Party: NGUYEN, CARYN HONG THUY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 01/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • CONFERENCE - STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 06/07/2016; Filing Party: KIM, JUNGYEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 05/20/2016; Filing Party: PARK, PETER SUNGWOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/28/2016; Filing Party: KIM, JUNGYEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 03/28/2016; Filing Party: KIM, JUNGYEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/28/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: KIM, JUNGYEON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/21/2016; Filing Party: PARK, PETER SUNGWOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: PARK, PETER SUNGWOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 02/26/2016; Filing Party: PARK, PETER SUNGWOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: PARK, PETER SUNGWOO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: PARK, PETER SUNGWOO

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.