This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:29:38 (UTC).

PETER L. ALBRECHT VS. SMART SOLAR MARKETING, A CA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 PETER L ALBRECHT filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SMART SOLAR MARKETING, A CA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETER L. ALBRECHT

Defendant

SMART SOLAR MARKETING, A CA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2016
  • SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT - FULL FILED BY ALBRECHT, PETER L. ON 09/22/2016; Filing Party: ALBRECHT, PETER L. ON 09/22/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11998830 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11822913.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2016
  • WRIT ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (SMALL CLAIMS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF JUDGMENT UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 06/06/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY ALBRECHT, PETER L. ON 03/07/2016; Filing Party: ALBRECHT, PETER L. ON 03/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 06 - SMALL CLAIMS GREATER THAN 12 WITHIN PREVIOUS 12 MONTHS IN THE AMOUNT OF 100.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927299 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751524.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ALBRECHT, PETER L. ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ALBRECHT, PETER L. ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.