This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 11:53:20 (UTC).

PETER FOX VS. ARCHITECTURAL INSTALLATION, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/06/2017 PETER FOX filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ARCHITECTURAL INSTALLATION, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PETER FOX

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC.

DAVID GOLDENBERG

ARCHITECTURAL INSTALLATION, INC.

LUXVUE LTD.

HALL MARK & ASSOCIATES, INC.

WATERPROOFING SYSTEMS CORP.

JONELL CONSTRUCTION

PMR CONSTRUCTION

Hall Mark & Associates

John Lisenby III

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

WOLF GROUP L.A.

WOLF WALLENSTEIN & ABRAMS, PC

Defendant, Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

MOKRI VANIS & JONES

DEMLER, ARMSTRONG & ROWLAND, LLP

Jeffery & Grosfeld, LLP

Springel & Fink LLP

Manning & Kass, Ellrod, Ramirez, Trester LLP

Other Attorneys

MANNING & KASS, ELLROD, RAMIREZ, TREST

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 07/30/2019 01:30:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 07/30/2019 01:30:00 PM.

REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 07/23/2019

REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 07/23/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2019

OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12547953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12371833.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12547953 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12371833.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 05/03/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 05/03/2019

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 05/03/2019

MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 05/03/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12546098 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12369965.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 37 - STIPULATION AND ORDER IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12546098 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12369965.

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 04/25/2019

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL) FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 04/25/2019

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/25/2019 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR EX PARTE 04/25/2019 08:30:00 AM.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 04/26/2019

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 04/26/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12539778 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12363597.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12539778 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12363597.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 04/24/2019

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 04/24/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/24/2019

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/24/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12536980 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12360786.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 585.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12536980 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12360786.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JONELL CONSTRUCTION ON 04/17/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY JONELL CONSTRUCTION ON 04/17/2019

89 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT 07/30/2019 01:30:00 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT CONTINUED TO 09/24/2019 AT 01:30 PM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO PARTY'S MOTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 09/24/2019 AT 01:30:00 PM IN C19 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPLY TO MOTION FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1647044 RECEIVED ON 07/23/2019 11:18:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • OPPOSITION FILED BY FISHER CONSTRUCTION, INC. ON 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2816895 RECEIVED ON 07/17/2019 05:25:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
151 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - PERSONAL FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1422921 RECEIVED ON 09/21/2017 11:46:57 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SCHWARM, WALTER ON 09/06/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12216105 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12039824.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY FOX, PETER ON 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3584253 RECEIVED ON 09/06/2017 03:10:02 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Fisher Construction is a litigant

Latest cases where LUXVUE LTD. DBA TRU ARCHITECTURAL is a litigant

Latest cases where ARCHITECTURAL INSTALLATION INC. DBA L&M INSTALLATION is a litigant

Latest cases where WATERPROOFING SYSTEMS CORP. DBA KAZEMI & ASSOC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant