This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/05/2019 at 06:45:13 (UTC).

PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC VS. WESTCLIFF MANAGEMENT GROUP

Case Summary

On 07/23/2019 PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against WESTCLIFF MANAGEMENT GROUP. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    07/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Fernando Serrano

Perla Global Capital Advisors, LLC

Defendant

Westcliff Management Group

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cornman & Swartz

Defendant Attorney

The Petrofsky Law Firm

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12633793 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12458292.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12633793 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12458292.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF MELISSA PETROFSKY) FILED BY WESTCLIFF MANAGEMENT GROUP ON 10/03/2019

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF MELISSA PETROFSKY) FILED BY WESTCLIFF MANAGEMENT GROUP ON 10/03/2019

DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY WESTCLIFF MANAGEMENT GROUP ON 10/03/2019

DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY WESTCLIFF MANAGEMENT GROUP ON 10/03/2019

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2836390 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2836390 REJECTED.

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SERRANO, FERNANDO; PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 09/16/2019

AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SERRANO, FERNANDO; PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 09/16/2019

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12592537 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12416591.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12592537 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12416591.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; SERRANO, FERNANDO ON 07/23/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; SERRANO, FERNANDO ON 07/23/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; SERRANO, FERNANDO ON 07/23/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; SERRANO, FERNANDO ON 07/23/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; SERRANO, FERNANDO ON 07/23/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; SERRANO, FERNANDO ON 07/23/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/04/2019
  • DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT SCHEDULED FOR 10/31/2019 AT 09:30:00 AM IN C03 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 172 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12633793 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12458292.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT (OF MELISSA PETROFSKY) FILED BY WESTCLIFF MANAGEMENT GROUP ON 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEMURRER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT) FILED BY WESTCLIFF MANAGEMENT GROUP ON 10/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1673231 RECEIVED ON 10/03/2019 03:48:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2836390 REJECTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED COMPLAINT (FIRST) FILED BY SERRANO, FERNANDO; PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 09/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2838017 RECEIVED ON 09/16/2019 02:21:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DDSLEGAL FOR 168 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER >$10K<=$25K IN THE AMOUNT OF 370.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12592537 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12416591.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; SERRANO, FERNANDO ON 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; SERRANO, FERNANDO ON 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC; SERRANO, FERNANDO ON 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1647388 RECEIVED ON 07/23/2019 05:34:15 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Perla Global Capital Advisors, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Westcliff Management Group is a litigant