This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 06/19/2017 at 04:06:38 (UTC).

PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC VS. B ALLEN BROWN

Case Summary

On 12/15/2015 PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against B ALLEN BROWN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    12/15/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC

Defendants

B ALLEN BROWN II

RAILMARK HOLDINGS INC.

B. ALLEN BROWN II

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOESCH LAW GROUP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 07/15/2016

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 07/15/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 07/06/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 07/06/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (OF ENTIRE CASE) FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 07/06/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (OF ENTIRE CASE) FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 07/06/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/03/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/03/2016 09:00:00 AM.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1325203 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1325203 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 06/02/2016

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 06/02/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2467248 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2467248 REJECTED.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 04/15/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 04/15/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 04/15/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 04/15/2016

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3400640 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3400640 REJECTED.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/15/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 04/15/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER) FILED BY BROWN II, B. ALLEN ON 01/28/2016

EX PARTE APPLICATION - OTHER (TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER) FILED BY BROWN II, B. ALLEN ON 01/28/2016

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 01/15/2016

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 01/15/2016

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 12/15/2015.

CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 12/15/2015.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11892633 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11716826.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11892633 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11716826.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 12/15/2015

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 12/15/2015

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 12/15/2015

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 12/15/2015

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 07/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3435765 RECEIVED ON 07/15/2016 02:48:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 07/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT (OF ENTIRE CASE) FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 07/06/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2475826 RECEIVED ON 07/06/2016 01:31:05 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 06/03/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 07/08/2016 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2016
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/08/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C22 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 01/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 01/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 01/15/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4490473 RECEIVED ON 01/15/2016 11:48:53 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SERVINO, DEBORAH ON 12/15/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11892633 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11716826.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 12/15/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 12/15/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PERLA GLOBAL CAPITAL ADVISORS, LLC ON 12/15/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1295253 RECEIVED ON 12/15/2015 01:47:37 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Perla Global Capital Advisors, LLC is a litigant