This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 02/22/2019 at 12:09:21 (UTC).

PEREZ V PEREZ

Case Summary

On 11/02/2012 PEREZ filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against PEREZ. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SARMIENTO, SALVADOR. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****0520

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2012

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

SARMIENTO, SALVADOR

 

Party Details

Petitioner

PEREZ, SALVADOR

Respondent

PEREZ, NANCY

Intervenors

CO OF ORANGE

COUNTY OF ORANGE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Intervenor Attorney

DCSS

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 12/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • MINUTES - DCSS ORDER 12/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL (GOVERNMENTAL) 11/01/2017; Filing Party: COUNTY OF ORANGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • STATUS - MEDIATION 11/01/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • APPOINTMENT - MEDIATION - SAME DAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • HEARING - RFO - MODIFICATION CUSTODY / VISITATION / SUPPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 12/06/2012 09:06:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: PEREZ, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 12/06/2012 11:55:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: PEREZ, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2012
  • NOTICE - OTHER 11/08/2012 11:41:00 # Pages:1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 11/02/2012 11:51:00 5C SENT TO L66 # Pages:2; Filing Party: PEREZ, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER DENIED - PAYMENT(S) ORDERED 11/02/2012 09:19:00 PAYMENTS # Pages:2; Filing Party: PEREZ, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 11/02/2012 14:38:00 # Pages:4; Filing Party: PEREZ, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 11/02/2012 14:38:00 # Pages:1; Filing Party: PEREZ, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 11/02/2012 14:38:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: PEREZ, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • SUMMONS 11/02/2012 14:37:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: PEREZ, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2012
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 11/02/2012 14:37:00 # Pages:2; Filing Party: PEREZ, SALVADOR

    Read MoreRead Less