This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 12/07/2021 at 06:33:05 (UTC).

PDTW, LLC VS. KRING & CHUNG

Case Summary

On 12/02/2019 PDTW, LLC filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against KRING CHUNG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Orange County Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Thomas Wylde Holdings, LLC

Defendants

Allyson Thompson

KF Professional Group

Roger Kou

Doug Lee

Kyu Hong Kim

Nolan Heimman

Joseph Foster

Laura Booth

Norman Ko

Laura Hess Pagter

Stanley Ducks, LLC

John Hanna

DSRB, LLC

Jene Park

Allison Kim

Andrew Alpheberg

Communication Launchpad, Inc.

Pagter & Pery Isaacon

Greenberg Glusker

23 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

LDT Consulting, Inc.

Defendant Attorneys

Long & Levit LLP

Chapman Glucksman Dean & Roeb

Lewis, Brisbois, Bisgaard & Smith, LLP

Lawstudios Richard Byron Peddie, P. C

HILL, FARRER & BURRILL

Other Attorneys

LONG & LEVIT

Kaufman Dolowich Voluck LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT (OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS KYU HONG KIM, KYU HONG KIM CPA, AND ALLISON KWON) FILED BY KIM, KYU HONG; KYU HONG KIM, CPA, INC.; KWON, ALLISON ON 11/04/2021

JUDGMENT (OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS KYU HONG KIM, KYU HONG KIM CPA, AND ALLISON KWON) FILED BY KIM, KYU HONG; KYU HONG KIM, CPA, INC.; KWON, ALLISON ON 11/04/2021

CASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 10/04/2021.

CASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 10/04/2021.

ORDER G059821

ORDER G059821

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PARK, JENE; THOMAS WYLDE, LLC ON 08/06/2021

NOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PARK, JENE; THOMAS WYLDE, LLC ON 08/06/2021

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/06/2021 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/06/2021 09:00:00 AM.

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PDTW, LLC ON 08/05/2021

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PDTW, LLC ON 08/05/2021

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PARK, JENE; THOMAS WYLDE, LLC ON 07/30/2021

STATUS CONFERENCE STATEMENT FILED BY PARK, JENE; THOMAS WYLDE, LLC ON 07/30/2021

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 07/14/2021.

NOTICE OF MAILING REGISTER OF ACTIONS

NOTICE OF MAILING REGISTER OF ACTIONS

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (AMENDED) FILED BY PDTW, LLC ON 03/25/2021

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL (AMENDED) FILED BY PDTW, LLC ON 03/25/2021

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3994604 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 3994604 REJECTED.

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY PDTW, LLC ON 03/23/2021

DESIGNATION OF RECORD ON APPEAL FILED BY PDTW, LLC ON 03/23/2021

ORDER G059821

ORDER G059821

ORDER G059293

ORDER G059293

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1818673 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1818673 REJECTED.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/18/2021 02:00:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MULTIPLE EVENTS 02/18/2021 02:00:00 PM.

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH NOTICE OF DEFAULT

NOTICE OF FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH NOTICE OF DEFAULT

ORDER G059821

ORDER G059821

286 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2022
  • HearingDescription: STATUS CONFERENCE; Judge: CLASTER; Department: CX104

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT (OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS KYU HONG KIM, KYU HONG KIM CPA, AND ALLISON KWON) FILED BY KIM, KYU HONG; KYU HONG KIM, CPA, INC.; KWON, ALLISON ON 11/04/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO CX104 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER ON 03/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO WILLIAM CLASTER EFFECTIVE 10/04/2021.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER G059821

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING FILED BY PARK, JENE; THOMAS WYLDE, LLC ON 08/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 41225576 RECEIVED ON 08/06/2021 10:18:29 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR STATUS CONFERENCE 08/06/2021 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 03/04/2022 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketSTATUS CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/04/2022 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX103 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
459 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE GLENDA SANDERS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HONORABLE JUDGE GLENDA SANDERS) FILED BY THOMAS, PAULA; THOMAS, PAULA; PDTW, LLC ON 12/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3864423 RECEIVED ON 12/06/2019 12:29:45 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12668761 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12493464.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 2865675 RECEIVED ON 12/02/2019 04:45:56 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER SANDERS, GLENDA ON 12/02/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT LIST FILED BY PDTW, LLC; THOMAS WYLDE HOLDINGS, LLC; PAULA THOMAS AS THE LAST KNOWN REPRESENTATIVE OF THOAMS WYLDE HOLDINGS, LLC; THOMAS, PAULA; THOMAS, PAULA ON 12/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PDTW, LLC; THOMAS WYLDE HOLDINGS, LLC; PAULA THOMAS AS THE LAST KNOWN REPRESENTATIVE OF THOAMS WYLDE HOLDINGS, LLC; THOMAS, PAULA; THOMAS, PAULA ON 12/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PDTW, LLC; THOMAS WYLDE HOLDINGS, LLC; PAULA THOMAS AS THE LAST KNOWN REPRESENTATIVE OF THOAMS WYLDE HOLDINGS, LLC; THOMAS, PAULA; THOMAS, PAULA ON 12/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PDTW, LLC; THOMAS WYLDE HOLDINGS, LLC; PAULA THOMAS AS THE LAST KNOWN REPRESENTATIVE OF THOAMS WYLDE HOLDINGS, LLC; THOMAS, PAULA; THOMAS, PAULA ON 12/02/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DSRB, LLC is a litigant