This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:22:45 (UTC).

PAYMAN ABOLFATHI VS SOOSAN ABOLFATHI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 PAYMAN ABOLFATHI filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SOOSAN ABOLFATHI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1699

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ABOLFATHI, PAYMAN

Respondent

ABOLFATHI, SOOSAN AMIDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

GARTMAN, LAUREL PENICHE

Other Attorneys

PENICHE-GARTMAN, LAUREL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 12/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 09/25/2018; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, SOOSAN AMIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 09/25/2018; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, SOOSAN AMIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • CONFERENCE - CASE RESOLUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY 08/06/2018 Substitution Of Attorney; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, PAYMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • STIPULATION - COURT APPOINTED TEMPORARY JUDGE 07/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 07/24/2018; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, SOOSAN AMIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2017
  • NOTICE - STATUS CONFERENCE - UNASSIGNED 01/04/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/23/2016; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, SOOSAN AMIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 03/23/2016; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, SOOSAN AMIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 03/23/2016; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, SOOSAN AMIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/23/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, SOOSAN AMIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/23/2016; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, SOOSAN AMIDI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/10/2016; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, PAYMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, PAYMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, PAYMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: ABOLFATHI, PAYMAN

    Read MoreRead Less