This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/07/2019 at 08:20:52 (UTC).

PAULE CANDY VS JONATHAN SHADDY

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 PAULE CANDY filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against JONATHAN SHADDY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MILLARD, MARK S.. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****1705

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

Judge

MILLARD, MARK S.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CANDY, PAULE

Respondent

SHADDY, JONATHAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KEVIN L. QUALLS

Respondent Attorney

MATTOS, TERESA MCNAMARA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 04/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2017
  • CONFERENCE - TRIAL SETTING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 03/15/2017; Filing Party: SHADDY, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • WAIVER - FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/15/2017; Filing Party: SHADDY, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • STIPULATION & WAIVERS (NO FEE) 03/15/2017; Filing Party: SHADDY, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 03/15/2017; Filing Party: SHADDY, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 03/15/2017; Filing Party: SHADDY, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • JUDGMENT - FAMILY CODE 2336 03/15/2017 Judge:MILLARD, MARK S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 02/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • CONFERENCE - TRIAL SETTING & JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT (AUTO)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 09/14/2016 preliminary; Filing Party: SHADDY, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • RETURN SHEET - AT ISSUE 09/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - MAIL 03/24/2016; Filing Party: SHADDY, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 03/24/2016; Filing Party: SHADDY, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • RESPONSE - DISSOLUTION 03/24/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: SHADDY, JONATHAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 03/16/2016; Filing Party: CANDY, PAULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 03/08/2016; Filing Party: CANDY, PAULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CANDY, PAULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SUMMONS 02/26/2016; Filing Party: CANDY, PAULE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 02/26/2016 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: CANDY, PAULE

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.