This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 05:58:34 (UTC).

PAUL ALVAREZ VS. BUILDING WORX INC.

Case Summary

On 11/12/2015 PAUL ALVAREZ filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against BUILDING WORX INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    11/12/2015

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAUL ALVAREZ

Defendants, Others and Cross Defendants

BUILDING WORX INC.

ROBERT ARTURA

RYAN ZIVELONGHI

PRECAST INNOVATIONS, INC

DNC PLUMBING

E.R.R.A. BROTHERS

PRECISION FRAMING SYSTEMS INC

YUKON PLASTERING INCORPORATED

J B P MECHANICAL

L I METAL SYSTEMS

DIAZ CONSTRUCTION COMPANY, INC

RAINY DAY ROOFING, INC

ERRA BROTHERS, INC.

FINELINE WOODWORKING, INC

CS DRYWALL INC

ASTRO COMPANY INC.

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BOJIC & LIVESAY LLP

Defendant and Other Attorneys

MILANI & ASSOCIATES, INC.

LAW OFFICE OF JILLISA L. O'BRIEN

Other and Cross Defendant Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF JILLISA L. O'BRIEN

SALEK LAW FIRM

HARTSUYKER, STRATMAN & WILLIAMS-ABREGO

CLINTON & CLINTON

BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER & LOWARY LLP

RESNICK & LOUIS, P. C

Other Attorneys

BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNEIDER & LOWAR

MURTAUGH MEYER NELSON & TREGLIA LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY YUKON PLASTERING INCORPORATED ON 01/24/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY YUKON PLASTERING INCORPORATED ON 01/24/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY YUKON PLASTERING INCORPORATED ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY YUKON PLASTERING INCORPORATED ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALVAREZ, PAUL ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALVAREZ, PAUL ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC. ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC. ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC. ON 01/23/2018

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC. ON 01/23/2018

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4786851 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4786851 REJECTED.

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC. ON 11/17/2017

ORDER - OTHER FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC. ON 11/17/2017

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 11/17/2017 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT 11/17/2017 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC.; ARTURA, ROBERT; ZIVELONGHI, RYAN ON 11/13/2017

NOTICE OF NON-OPPOSITION FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC.; ARTURA, ROBERT; ZIVELONGHI, RYAN ON 11/13/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/13/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 11/13/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4774184 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4774184 REJECTED.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233774 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057456.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 36 - MOTION OR OTHER (NOT 1ST) PAPER REQUIRING A HEARING IN THE AMOUNT OF 60.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12233774 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12057456.

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC.; ARTURA, ROBERT; ZIVELONGHI, RYAN ON 10/10/2017

MOTION FOR DETERMINATION OF GOOD FAITH SETTLEMENT FILED BY BUILDING WORX INC.; ARTURA, ROBERT; ZIVELONGHI, RYAN ON 10/10/2017

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1427127 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1427127 REJECTED.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/04/2017

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/04/2017

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/26/2017 03:26:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 09/26/2017 03:26:00 PM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, PAUL ON 09/20/2017

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY ALVAREZ, PAUL ON 09/20/2017

106 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY YUKON PLASTERING INCORPORATED ON 01/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2633386 RECEIVED ON 01/24/2018 11:06:51 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - PARTY FILED BY YUKON PLASTERING INCORPORATED ON 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3628975 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2018 05:04:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE - ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ALVAREZ, PAUL ON 01/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1461514 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2018 04:21:54 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • CROSS-COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
180 More Docket Entries
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 2015-11-13 13:36:00.0.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • THE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE IS SCHEDULED FOR 03/01/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT CX102.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/01/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN CX102 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER MOSS, ROBERT ON 11/12/2015.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER, 34 - COMPLEX CASE FEE - PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF 1,435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11877451 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11701642.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY ALVAREZ, PAUL ON 11/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY ALVAREZ, PAUL ON 11/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY ALVAREZ, PAUL ON 11/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2015
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3351373 RECEIVED ON 11/12/2015 03:41:07 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where E.R.R.A. BROTHERS INC. L.P. is a litigant

Latest cases where PRECISION FRAMING SYSTEMS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where YUKON PLASTERING INCORPORATED is a litigant

Latest cases where FINELINE WOODWORKING, INC. is a litigant