This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/27/2022 at 04:37:33 (UTC).

PATRICK CHUNG VS. THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA

Case Summary

On 05/03/2022 PATRICK CHUNG filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Patrick Chung

Defendant

The Regents of the University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Leslie Glyer Law, P.C.

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13043861 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12871877.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13043861 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12871877.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/03/2022

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/03/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/03/2022

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/03/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/03/2022

COMPLAINT FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/03/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/12/2022

NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/12/2022

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/11/2022 11:27:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/11/2022 11:27:00 AM.

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/06/2022

PEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/06/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • HearingDescription: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: HOFFER; Department: C16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE REASSIGNED TO C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER ON 10/24/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 21158839 RECEIVED ON 05/12/2022 10:20:41 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE - OTHER FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/12/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketCASE REASSIGNED TO DAVID HOFFER EFFECTIVE 05/11/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE UNDER C.C.P. 170.6 AS TO THE HONORABLE DEREK W. HUNT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • DocketTHIS CASE IS REASSIGNED TO THE HONORABLE DAVID A. HOFFER FOR ALL PURPOSES.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 05/11/2022 11:27:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31154033 RECEIVED ON 05/06/2022 06:08:10 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPEREMPTORY CHALLENGE PURSUANT TO 170.6 CCP (HON. DEREK HUNT) FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/06/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 31152304 RECEIVED ON 05/03/2022 04:14:39 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY LEGALCONNECT FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 13043861 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12871877.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/24/2022 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C23 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY CHUNG, PATRICK ON 05/03/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HUNT, DEREK ON 05/03/2022.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant