This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 05/11/2017 at 03:59:40 (UTC).

PATRICIA SEIDLER VS. CITY OF IRVINE

Case Summary

On 10/08/2014 PATRICIA SEIDLER filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY OF IRVINE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/08/2014

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PATRICIA SEIDLER

Defendants and Others

THE IRVINE COMPANY

CITY OF IRVINE

THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC

Cross Defendant

CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAY DAY & BROWN

Defendant and Other Attorneys

WOODRUFF, SPRADLIN & SMART, APC

CHILD & MARTON LLP

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTE ORDER, DATED 4/6/2016

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTE ORDER, DATED 4/6/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/06/2016 03:12:00 PM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/06/2016 03:12:00 PM.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 04/05/2016

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 04/05/2016

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR MANDATORY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE 01/15/2016 09:00:00 AM.

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 10/15/2015

NOTICE OF TRIAL FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 10/15/2015

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ORDER) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 10/02/2015

STIPULATION AND ORDER (TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND ORDER) FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 10/02/2015

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/01/2015.

PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER RECEIVED ON 10/01/2015.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1280620 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1280620 REJECTED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 03/13/2015

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 03/13/2015

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/10/2015 08:30:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 03/10/2015 08:30:00 AM.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11746485 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11570688.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 209 - ADVANCED JURY FEE (NON-REFUNDABLE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 150.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11746485 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11570688.

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 03/02/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 03/02/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 03/03/2015

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 03/03/2015

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11700753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11525056.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11700753 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11525056.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 12/03/2014

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED BY THE IRVINE COMPANY LLC ON 12/03/2014

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 10/08/2014

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 10/08/2014

COMPLAINT FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 10/08/2014

COMPLAINT FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 10/08/2014

26 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE 05/25/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/25/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT-ORDERED DISMISSAL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/24/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4552245 REJECTED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL OF MINUTE ORDER, DATED 4/6/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CHAMBERS WORK 04/06/2016 03:12:00 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • THE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE IS SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT C-20.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2016
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL ON SETTLED CASE SCHEDULED FOR 05/25/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 04/05/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 12/03/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3222495 RECEIVED ON 12/03/2014 11:53:35 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 03/10/2015 AT 08:30:00 AM IN C20 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY CITY OF IRVINE ON 10/28/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4269728 RECEIVED ON 10/28/2014 09:50:45 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER CHAFFEE, DAVID ON 10/08/2014.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 194 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11673164 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11497307.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 10/08/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 10/08/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/08/2014
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY SEIDLER, PATRICIA ON 10/08/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/09/2014
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3199756 RECEIVED ON 10/08/2014 01:53:14 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CUESTA PROPERTIES, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where The Irvine Company, LLC is a litigant