Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/10/2019 at 07:53:27 (UTC).

PATRICIA OSEGUEDA VS ISMAEL MENDOZA

Case Summary

On 05/03/2017 PATRICIA OSEGUEDA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against ISMAEL MENDOZA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****3665

  • Filing Date:

    05/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

Respondent

MENDOZA, ISMAEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2017
  • DECLARATION - DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED JUDGMENT 07/19/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • JUDGMENT - DISSOLUTION 07/19/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • NOTICE - ENTRY OF JUDGMENT 07/19/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • HEARING - DISSOLUTION - UNCONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • MEMORANDUM - SET HEARING 06/12/2017 DEFAULT HEARING ON 07/19/17; SENT TO C63. JM; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 06/07/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • REQUEST - ENTER DEFAULT 06/07/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DECLARATION - SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE 05/04/2017 PRELIM; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE - SUMMONS 05/04/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • ORDER - FEE WAIVER GRANTED BY CLERK 05/03/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • REQUEST - WAIVE COURT FEES 05/03/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - COMMUNITY 05/03/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • PROPERTY DECLARATION - SEPARATE 05/03/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • INCOME & EXPENSE DECLARATION 05/03/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 05/03/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • DECLARATION - UNIFORM CUSTODY 05/03/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • SUMMONS 05/03/2017; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2017
  • PETITION - DISSOLUTION 05/03/2017 Amount:$435.00; Filing Party: OSEGUEDA, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less