This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 03/11/2019 at 06:18:04 (UTC).

PATRICIA ANDERSON-HOOPER VS MIRANDA SICRE

Case Summary

On 10/10/2017 a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce case was filed by PATRICIA ANDERSON-HOOPER against MIRANDA SICRE in the jurisdiction of Orange County Superior Courts, Lamoreaux Justice Center located in Orange, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *****2493

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Undetermined

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Lamoreaux Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

Judge Details

PALAFOX, JULIE A.

 

Party Details

Others

SICRE, MIRANDA ANDERSON

HOOPER, PATRICIA ANDERSON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 04/13/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • RESPONSIVE DECLARATION - REQUEST FOR ORDER 04/13/2018; Filing Party: SICRE, MIRANDA ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 03/20/2018; Filing Party: SICRE, MIRANDA ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • MINUTE ORDER 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • HEARING - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DV ORDER - REQUEST TO CONTINUE 03/20/2018 Due Date:03/13/2018; Filing Party: ANDERSON-HOOPER, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2018
  • DV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 03/19/2018; Filing Party: ANDERSON-HOOPER, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • PROOF OF SERVICE 03/09/2018; Filing Party: SICRE, MIRANDA ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 10/23/2017
  • DV ANSWER - TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER 10/23/2017; Filing Party: ANDERSON-HOOPER, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER - REASSIGNMENT - RELATED CASE 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • MINUTE ORDER - REASSIGNMENT - RELATED CASE 10/13/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • RESPONSE - MOTION OR OPPOSITION 10/10/2017; Filing Party: ANDERSON-HOOPER, PATRICIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE - RELATED CASE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: SICRE, MIRANDA ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV REQUEST - RESTRAINING ORDER 10/10/2017; Filing Party: SICRE, MIRANDA ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV NOTICE - COURT HEARING DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: SICRE, MIRANDA ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • DV PROOF - PERSONAL SERVICE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: SICRE, MIRANDA ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • HEARING - EX PARTE - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • EX PARTE REQUEST - DOMESTIC VIOLENCE 10/10/2017; Filing Party: SICRE, MIRANDA ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.