This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:09:13 (UTC).

PATI BISSON VS. YGRENE ENERGY FUND, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/18/2019 PATI BISSON filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against YGRENE ENERGY FUND, INC. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Central Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CJC

  • Filing Date:

    03/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Courthouse:

    Central Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Pati Bisson

Defendants

Golden State Finance Authority

All American Design, Inc.

Ygrene Energy Fund, Inc.

Ygrene Energy Fund Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

University of California, Irvine School of Law

Defendant Attorney

Buckley LLP

Other Attorneys

UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA, IRVINE SCHOO

 

Court Documents

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOLDEN STATE FINANCE AUTHORITY ON 07/24/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOLDEN STATE FINANCE AUTHORITY ON 07/24/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDEN STATE FINANCE AUTHORITY ON 07/23/2019

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDEN STATE FINANCE AUTHORITY ON 07/23/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YGRENE ENERGY FUND INC. ON 07/10/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY YGRENE ENERGY FUND INC. ON 07/10/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 07/09/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE BY MAIL FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 07/09/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 07/09/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 07/09/2019

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF MAILING/ELECTRONIC SERVICE

APPLICATION AND ORDER (TO SERVE THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE) FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 07/08/2019

APPLICATION AND ORDER (TO SERVE THE CALIFORNIA SECRETARY OF STATE) FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 07/08/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 06/26/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 06/26/2019

APPLICATION AND ORDER (TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE) RECEIVED ON 06/26/2019.

APPLICATION AND ORDER (TO SERVE SECRETARY OF STATE) RECEIVED ON 06/26/2019.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12554864 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12378737.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY ONELEGAL FOR 195 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER IN THE AMOUNT OF 435.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12554864 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12378737.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 04/30/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 30-DAY SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - SUBSTITUTE FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 04/30/2019

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/20/2019

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/20/2019

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 03/18/2019.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 03/18/2019.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

COMPLAINT FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE - OTHER FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 08/06/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/06/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1652274 RECEIVED ON 08/06/2019 02:24:34 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE 07/25/2019 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE CONTINUED TO 10/02/2019 AT 09:00 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT PURSUANT TO COURT'S MOTION.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR 10/02/2019 AT 09:00:00 AM IN C42 AT CENTRAL JUSTICE CENTER.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT FILED BY GOLDEN STATE FINANCE AUTHORITY ON 07/24/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4993959 RECEIVED ON 07/24/2019 11:43:36 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY GOLDEN STATE FINANCE AUTHORITY ON 07/23/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2818868 RECEIVED ON 07/23/2019 03:59:56 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 44 - COPY OF ANY RECORD (PER SIDE) IN THE AMOUNT OF 37.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12584782 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12408828.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE BY MAIL (OUT OF PROCESS) GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • BISSON, PATI REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES GRANTED IN WHOLE ON 03/20/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CASE ASSIGNED TO JUDICIAL OFFICER HOFFER, DAVID ON 03/18/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) RECEIVED ON 03/18/2019.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY BISSON, PATI ON 03/18/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1602658 RECEIVED ON 03/18/2019 03:22:42 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less