This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 10/23/2020 at 20:02:17 (UTC).

PARVIZ ALAI VS. MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/10/2020 PARVIZ ALAI filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Civil Complex Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-CXC

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARVIZ ALAI

Defendants

J.K. PROPERTIES, LLC

MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY

WONNIE WON-SUK KIM, INDIVIDU

WON SUK KIM REAL ESTATE INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2021
  • HearingDescription: SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL; Department: CX101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/2021 AT 01:30:00 PM IN CX101 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY ALAI, PARVIZ ON 10/15/2020; Filing Party: ALAI, PARVIZ ON 10/15/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY ALAI, PARVIZ FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12765359 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12591846.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketSMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 11/02/2020 AT 09:00:00 AM IN CX101 AT CIVIL COMPLEX CENTER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2020
  • DocketPLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY ALAI, PARVIZ ON 08/10/2020; Filing Party: ALAI, PARVIZ ON 08/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WON SUK KIM REAL ESTATE INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where J.K. PROPERTIES INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where MERCURY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant