This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 03:42:25 (UTC).

PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC VS. PETER LE

Case Summary

On 01/13/2016 PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against PETER LE. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC

Defendant

PETER LE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/21/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/21/2016

ORDER - OTHER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/21/2016

ORDER - OTHER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/21/2016

PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/02/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/02/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/02/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/02/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/02/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/02/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/11/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/11/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11918743 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11742940.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11918743 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11742940.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/10/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/09/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED ON 02/10/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/09/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 02/09/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 02/09/2016

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 02/10/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/09/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED & ENTERED 02/10/2016) RECEIVED ON 02/09/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 02/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 02/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 02/09/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 02/09/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 02/09/2016

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 02/09/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 01/21/2016

APPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 01/21/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11908075 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11732

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11908075 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11732292.

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/21/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/21/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1307793 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016 01:18:07 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/02/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/02/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 03/02/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 1307794 RECEIVED ON 03/02/2016 01:18:09 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 01/21/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 37 - REQUESTS NOT REQUIRING A HEARING: CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; STIPULATION AND ORDER; SERVICE BY POSTING OR PUBLICATION IN THE AMOUNT OF 20.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11908075 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11732292.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION AND ORDER TO SERVE SUMMONS BY POSTING - UNLAWFUL DETAINER RECEIVED ON 01/20/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3372357 RECEIVED ON 01/20/2016 10:54:30 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11904962 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11729191.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 01/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 01/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PARK PLACE MICHELSON LLC ON 01/13/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4488974 RECEIVED ON 01/13/2016 09:02:08 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Park Place Michelson LLC is a litigant