This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:46:42 (UTC).

PARK II SPECTRUM LLC VS. JIAGUO YANG

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 PARK II SPECTRUM LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JIAGUO YANG. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK II SPECTRUM LLC

Defendant

JIAGUO YANG

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP.

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/10/2016

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/10/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/21/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/21/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2458380 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 2458380 REJECTED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/21/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/21/2016

ORDER - OTHER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/29/2016

ORDER - OTHER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/29/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/10/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/10/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/10/2016

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/10/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 03/22/16) RECEIVED ON 03/21/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 03/22/16) RECEIVED ON 03/21/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 05/10/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 05/10/2016.

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/07/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/07/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1318956 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 1318956 REJECTED.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/10/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/10/2016.

JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 06/29/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 06/29/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11939716 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11763905.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11939716 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11763905.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927023 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751248.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927023 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751248.

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4539174 REJECTED.

E-FILING TRANSACTION NUMBER 4539174 REJECTED.

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 06/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY THE SUPERIOR COURT OF ORANGE ON 06/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 05/10/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2461655 RECEIVED ON 05/10/2016 04:29:27 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 05/10/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/10/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2461654 RECEIVED ON 05/10/2016 04:29:12 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT (& CLERK'S JUDGMENT) FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2452533 RECEIVED ON 03/21/2016 11:06:12 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927023 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751248.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509422 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:34:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.