This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/15/2018 at 03:23:03 (UTC).

PARK II SPECTRUM LLC VS. DONGMEI ZHAO

Case Summary

On 03/09/2016 PARK II SPECTRUM LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against DONGMEI ZHAO. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK II SPECTRUM LLC

Defendants

DONGMEI ZHAO

SHUHANG SUN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP.

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/04/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/04/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/18/2016

JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/18/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777277.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777277.

WRIT (ISSUED 4/18/16) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 4/18/16) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/15/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/15/2016

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 04/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

MINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 04/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

COURT TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 04/13/2016 AT 09:00:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

REQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY SUN, SHUHANG FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11936829 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11761015.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY SUN, SHUHANG FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11936829 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11761015.

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SUN, SHUHANG ON 03/15/2016

ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SUN, SHUHANG ON 03/15/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11933552 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11757730.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11933552 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11757730.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/09/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/09/2016

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/04/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketCASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT FINDING.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/18/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11953112 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11777277.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT (ISSUED 4/18/16) RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/15/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3403736 RECEIVED ON 04/15/2016 03:57:43 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMINUTES FINALIZED FOR COURT TRIAL 04/13/2016 09:00:00 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST/COUNTER-REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL - UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/29/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 4525153 RECEIVED ON 03/29/2016 04:01:29 PM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY SUN, SHUHANG FOR 173 - ANSWER OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K IN THE AMOUNT OF 225.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11936829 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11761015.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED BY SUN, SHUHANG ON 03/15/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11933552 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11757730.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED BY PARK II SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/09/2016

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2016
  • DocketE-FILING TRANSACTION 3389312 RECEIVED ON 03/09/2016 11:38:30 AM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PARK II SPECTRUM LLC is a litigant