This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 08/09/2019 at 10:25:40 (UTC).

PARK I SPECTRUM LLC VS. JOHN FISCHBECK

Case Summary

On 08/14/2017 PARK I SPECTRUM LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against JOHN FISCHBECK. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK I SPECTRUM LLC

Defendant

JOHN FISCHBECK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE, & COUGHLIN, LLP

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12504594 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12328316.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12504594 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12328316.

WRIT (ISSUED 2/22/2019) RECEIVED ON 01/23/2019.

WRIT (ISSUED 2/22/2019) RECEIVED ON 01/23/2019.

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/26/2017

DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/26/2017

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/26/2017.

PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/26/2017.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/26/2017

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/26/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/26/2017

REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/26/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/14/2017

WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED - WHOLLY SATISFIED FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/14/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12211258 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034953.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12211258 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12034953.

WRIT (ISSUED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/28/2017.

WRIT (ISSUED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/28/2017.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/28/2017.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED 8/28/17) RECEIVED ON 08/28/2017.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12203255 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12026980.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12203255 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12026980.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/14/2017

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/14/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/14/2017

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/14/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/14/2017

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/14/2017

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12504594 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12328316.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS AFTER JUDGMENT; ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT AND DECLARATION OF ACCRUED INTEREST - $100 OR GREATER FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 01/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 2/22/2019) RECEIVED ON 01/23/2019.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2754859 RECEIVED ON 01/23/2019 04:02:16 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 09/26/2017.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 09/26/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 1414914 RECEIVED ON 08/28/2017 12:05:19 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12203255 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 12026980.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 08/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3576467 RECEIVED ON 08/14/2017 11:47:48 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less