This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/14/2018 at 11:48:56 (UTC).

PARK I SPECTRUM LLC VS. CHENGXI LI

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 PARK I SPECTRUM LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CHENGXI LI. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PARK I SPECTRUM LLC

Defendant

CHENGXI LI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUZICKA, WALLACE & COUGHLIN, LLP.

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016.

PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016

PROPOSED ORDER RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

WRIT (ISSUED 03/14/16) RECEIVED ON 03/14/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 03/14/16) RECEIVED ON 03/14/2016.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927063 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751288.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927063 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751288.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/15/16) RECEIVED ON 03/14/2016.

JUDGMENT (FILED & ENTERED 03/15/16) RECEIVED ON 03/14/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION SUBMITTED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC REJECTED ON 03/15/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION SUBMITTED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC REJECTED ON 03/15/2016.

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/26/2016

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/26/2016

ORDER - OTHER (COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/16/2016

ORDER - OTHER (COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/16/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/25/2016

WRIT OF POSSESSION - UNSATISFIED FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/25/2016

PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016.

PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016.

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/16/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER - OTHER (COPIES IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 05/16/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED ORDER (ADMITTING COPIES OF DOCUMENTS IN LIEU OF ORIGINALS) RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2458384 RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016 01:53:33 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 2458383 RECEIVED ON 04/27/2016 01:53:25 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT CCP 585(D) FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL OF DOES FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COURT DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 04/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR CLERK'S DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 03/14/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4516931 RECEIVED ON 03/14/2016 12:00:55 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY PASZKOATTORNEYSERVICES FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927063 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751288.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PARK I SPECTRUM LLC ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3385080 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 09:52:01 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less