This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/20/2018 at 19:28:20 (UTC).

PAIGE ALDEN RENEAU VS. ERIC HOGAN

Case Summary

On 02/26/2016 PAIGE ALDEN RENEAU filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ERIC HOGAN. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-HNB

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Harbor Justice Center Newport Beach

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAIGE ALDEN RENEAU

Defendant

ERIC HOGAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2016
  • CASE DISMISSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • COURT ORDERS THE ENTIRE ACTION DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF COURT DISMISSAL- LACK OF PROSECUTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 12/19/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL CONTINUED TO 12/19/2016 AT 08:30 AM IN THIS DEPARTMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 12/19/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2016
  • MINUTES FINALIZED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL 09/26/2016 08:30:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY RENEAU, PAIGE ALDEN ON 09/21/2016; Filing Party: RENEAU, PAIGE ALDEN ON 09/21/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 09/26/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2016
  • REQUEST FOR RESET OF SMALL CLAIMS HEARING FILED BY RENEAU, PAIGE ALDEN ON 06/01/2016; Filing Party: RENEAU, PAIGE ALDEN ON 06/01/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL SCHEDULED FOR 06/06/2016 AT 08:30:00 AM IN H10 AT HARBOR JUSTICE CENTER - NEWPORT BEACH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY DOE, JOHN FOR 05 - SMALL CLAIMS >$5,000<=$10,000 IN THE AMOUNT OF 75.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 11927427 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11751652.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 4509772 RECEIVED ON 02/26/2016 03:11:11 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO GO TO SMALL CLAIMS COURT FILED BY RENEAU, PAIGE ALDEN ON 02/26/2016; Filing Party: RENEAU, PAIGE ALDEN ON 02/26/2016

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.