Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Superior Courts on 04/19/2018 at 09:22:29 (UTC).

PACIFIC PALMS, LLC VS. FLORIDALMA PADILLA

Case Summary

On 10/18/2016 PACIFIC PALMS, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against FLORIDALMA PADILLA. This case was filed in Orange County Superior Courts, North Justice Center located in Orange, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-NJC

  • Filing Date:

    10/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Orange County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    North Justice Center

  • County, State:

    Orange, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PACIFIC PALMS, LLC

Defendant

FLORIDALMA PADILLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVID S. SCHONFELD, A PROFESSIONAL LAW CORPORATION

 

Court Documents

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12059710 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11883675.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12059710 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11883675.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/09/16 POSSESSION ONLY) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016.

WRIT (ISSUED 11/09/16 POSSESSION ONLY) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/09/16) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/09/16) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/09/16) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016.

JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/09/16) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 11/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 11/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 11/07/2016

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 11/07/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 11/07/2016

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 11/07/2016

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047929 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871874.

PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047929 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871874.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 10/18/2016

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 10/18/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 10/18/2016

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 10/18/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 10/18/2016

COMPLAINT FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 10/18/2016

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2016
  • CASE DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • COMPLAINT DISPOSED WITH DISPOSITION OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 141 - WRIT IN THE AMOUNT OF 25.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12059710 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11883675.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT (ISSUED 11/09/16 POSSESSION ONLY) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/09/16) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT - UNLAWFUL DETAINER (FILED AND ENTERED ON 11/09/16) RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT - UNNAMED OCCUPANTS FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 11/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 11/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 11/07/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3476719 RECEIVED ON 11/07/2016 10:22:20 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE THAT YOU HAVE BEEN SUED OC GENERATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PAYMENT RECEIVED BY CONTINUINGEDUCATIONOFTHEBAR FOR 171 - COMPLAINT OR OTHER 1ST PAPER <=$10K (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) IN THE AMOUNT OF 240.00, TRANSACTION NUMBER 12047929 AND RECEIPT NUMBER 11871874.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 10/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 10/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED BY PACIFIC PALMS, LLC ON 10/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2016
  • E-FILING TRANSACTION 3470026 RECEIVED ON 10/18/2016 05:40:42 PM.

    Read MoreRead Less